2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1246

File Code: Real Property Prior Year Introduction As: HB 842/10 - ENV Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 946
Sponsored By:
Delegates Conway, Arora, Bobo, Braveboy, Cullison, Frush, Kramer, Niemann, Healey, and Cane
Entitled:
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens

Synopsis:

Providing that, in the case of a foreclosure on a mortgage or deed of trust on a condominium unit, a specified portion of the condominium's liens on the unit has priority over the claim of the holder of a first mortgage or first deed of trust under specified circumstances; providing that lot owners in a homeowners association are liable for specified assessments and charges; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/21
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/7
Re-referred Environmental Matters
3/8
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1

Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate McComas) Adopted
3/31
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (42-93)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (36-99)
Special Order until later today (Delegate Niemann) Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Niemann) Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed (91-43)
4/9
Returned Passed
Senate Action
4/3
First Reading Senate Rules
4/8
Re-referred Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/6
Favorable
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
4/7
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 387

Sponsored by:

Delegate Norman H. Conway, District 38B
Delegate Sam Arora, District 19
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate Aisha N. Braveboy, District 25
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Benjamin F. Kramer, District 19
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Assessments
Condominiums
Disclosure
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates.
Foreclosure
Forms
Homeowners Associations
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Liens -see also- Mechanics' Liens
Mortgages
Notices
Secretary of State

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Real Property
( 11-110 , 11-110 , 11B-117 , 11B-117 , 14-203 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 120518/01     Offered on: April 1, 2011   at: 11:51 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 243523/01     Offered on: April 5, 2011   at: 12:11 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 310011/01     Offered on: April 5, 2011   at: 6:39 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 400110/01     Offered on: April 5, 2011   at: 12:57 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 773620/01     Offered on: April 5, 2011   at: 11:59 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
House
Environmental Matters
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 31, 2011: Floor Amendment (McComas) {773620/1 Rejected (42-93)
March 31, 2011: Floor Amendment (McComas) {243523/1 Rejected (36-99)
April 2, 2011: Third Reading Passed (91-43)
Senate
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)