2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 117

File Code: Commercial Law - Consumer Protection Prior Year Introduction As: HB 1202/06 - ECM
Sponsored By:
Delegates Lee, Rudolph, Goldwater, Ali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Bobo, Bronrott, Dumais, Frank, Gaines, Gilchrist, Harrison, Hecht, Howard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, James, Kach, Kaiser, Kirk, Krysiak, Kullen, Lawton, Manno, McDonough, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, O'Donnell, Rice, Shank, Shewell, Simmons, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, Stukes, Taylor, F. Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Braveboy, Burns, Davis, Haddaway, Love, Jameson, J. King, Mathias, McHale, Minnick, Walkup, Holmes, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Elmore, George, and Sossi
Entitled:
Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Consumer Reports - Security Freezes

Synopsis:

Authorizing a consumer to elect to place a security freeze on the consumer's consumer report; establishing procedures for requesting a security freeze; requiring a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze on a consumer's consumer report within specified time periods after specified requests are received in specified manners and to take specified actions within 5 business days after placing a security freeze on a consumer's consumer report; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
1/24
First Reading Economic Matters
1/31
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/18
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
4/5
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/21
First Reading Finance
3/22
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 308

Sponsored by:

Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Curt Anderson, District 43
Delegate Susan L. M. Aumann, District 42
Delegate Charles Barkley, District 39
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate Aisha N. Braveboy, District 25
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Emmett C. Burns, Jr., District 10
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Dereck E. Davis, District 25
Delegate Kathleen M. Dumais, District 15
Delegate Donald H. Dwyer, Jr., District 31
Delegate Adelaide C. Eckardt, District 37
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate D. Page Elmore, District 38A
Delegate William J. Frank, District 42
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Ronald A. George, District 30
Delegate Jim Gilchrist, District 17
Delegate Marilyn R. Goldwater, District 16
Delegate Jeannie Haddaway, District 37B
Delegate Hattie N. Harrison, District 45
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate Carolyn J. B. Howard, District 24
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Rick Impallaria, District 7
Delegate Jolene Ivey, District 47
Delegate Mary-Dulany James, District 34A
Delegate Sally Jameson, District 28
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5
Delegate Anne R. Kaiser, District 14
Delegate James S. King, District 33A
Delegate Ruth M. Kirk, District 44
Delegate Carolyn J. Krysiak, District 46
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Jane E. Lawton, District 18
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Roger Manno, District 19
Delegate James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38B
Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Brian K. McHale, District 46
Delegate Joseph J. Minnick, District 6
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Anthony J. O'Donnell, District 29C
Delegate Craig L. Rice, District 15
Delegate David D. Rudolph, District 34B
Delegate Christopher B. Shank, District 2B
Delegate Tanya Shewell, District 5A
Delegate Luiz R. S. Simmons, District 17
Delegate Michael D. Smigiel, Sr., District 36
Delegate Richard A. Sossi, District 36
Delegate Donna Stifler, District 35A
Delegate Nancy R. Stocksdale, District 5A
Delegate Melvin Stukes, District 44
Delegate Herman L. Taylor, Jr., District 14
Delegate Frank S. Turner, District 13
Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26
Delegate Joseph F. Vallario, Jr., District 27A
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24
Delegate Jeff Waldstreicher, District 18
Delegate Mary Roe Walkup, District 36

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Credit
Disclosure
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Identification
Notices
Penalties
Privacy
Reports
Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Bill affects the following Statute:

Commercial Law
( 14-1212.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 193699/01     Offered on: March 20, 2007   at: 10:24 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 257374/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 5:45 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 18, 2007: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
April 5, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
April 3, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)