2007 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 268

File Code: Higher Education Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 1056
Sponsored By:
Senators Conway, Astle, Britt, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Della, Dyson, Exum, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Greenip, Haines, Hogan, Hooper, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lenett, McFadden, Middleton, Munson, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Zirkin
Entitled:
Higher Education - Blind and Print Disabled Students - Instructional Materials

Synopsis:

Requiring the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to convene an Instructional Materials Access Guidelines Committee on or before December 1, 2007, in order to coordinate the distribution of instructional materials to blind and other print disabled students; providing for the membership of the Committee; providing for the termination of the Committee; providing for the content of specified guidelines; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
1/30
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/7
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/20
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/2
Special Order later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Senate Requests House Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Senators Lenett, Hooper, and Dyson
4/4
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
4/6
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/18
First Reading Ways and Means
3/28
Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/1
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/2
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
4/4
House Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Delegates Olszewski, Kaiser, and McKee
4/6
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/8
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 317

Sponsored by:

Senator Joan Carter Conway, District 43
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator Gwendolyn Britt, District 47
Senator Jim Brochin, District 42
Senator Richard F. Colburn, District 37
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr., District 32
Senator George W. Della, Jr., District 46
Senator Roy P. Dyson, District 29
Senator Nathaniel Exum, District 24
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Janet Greenip, District 33
Senator Larry E. Haines, District 5
Senator Patrick J. Hogan, District 39
Senator J. Robert Hooper, District 35
Senator Verna L. Jones, District 44
Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer, District 12
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Rona E. Kramer, District 14
Senator Mike Lenett, District 19
Senator Nathaniel J. McFadden, District 45
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Donald F. Munson, District 2
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator James N. Robey, District 13
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6
Senator Bobby A. Zirkin, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Appropriations
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Computers -see also- Electronic Commerce; Electronic Govmnt.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Department of
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Libraries -see also- Archives
Notices
Publications -see also- Maryland Register
Students
Textbooks

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Education
( 11-901 , 11-902 , 11-903 , 11-904 , 11-905 , 11-906 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 574033/01     Offered on: March 16, 2007   at: 11:34 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 694935/01     Offered on: March 16, 2007   at: 11:35 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 755468/01     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 11:44 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents (Displayed in PDF Format):
Report Number: 973827/1     Offered on: April 9, 2007   at: 10:47 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 513721/1     Offered on: April 9, 2007   at: 10:47 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 20, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 4, 2007: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
House
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (140-0)
April 6, 2007: Third Reading Passed (139-0)