2007 Regular Session

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 8

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 31

    Status as of February 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Morhaim, Cardin, Costa, Kach, and Stein
    Entitled
    Community or Homeowners' Associations - Standing to Participate in Certain Proceedings
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 314

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 177

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Rosenberg, Benson, Doory, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Kullen, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Maryland Human Relations Commission - Hearings and Civil Actions - Relief
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 369

    Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Braveboy, Griffith, Davis, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Transition of Association Control - Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 889

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 438

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Burns, Anderson, Aumann, Cane, Elmore, Frank, Jennings, Nathan-Pulliam, Smigiel, Stukes, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Commercial Vehicle Warranty Enforcement - Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 902

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Niemann
    Entitled
    Task Force to Promote Nonviolent and Peaceful Ways to Resolve Conflict
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 65

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Brochin, Della, Haines, Raskin, and Stone
    Entitled
    Community or Homeowners' Associations - Standing to Participate in Certain Proceedings
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 678

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 176

    Sponsored By
    Senators Raskin, Britt, Della, Frosh, Gladden, Pinsky, and Conway
    Entitled
    Maryland Human Relations Commission - Hearings and Civil Actions - Relief
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 823

    Status as of March 29, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Britt, Forehand, Madaleno, Muse, Pugh, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Task Force to Promote Nonviolent and Peaceful Ways to Resolve Conflict
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings