2007 Regular Session

Automotive Repair

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 8

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 448

    Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Gilchrist, Hixson, Ivey, and Kaiser
    Entitled
    Sales and Use Tax - Services
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 747

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 343

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Bronrott
    Entitled
    Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers - Warranty Adjustment Programs
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 801

    Status as of March 16, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Malone
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Certificate of Title - Rebuilt Salvage
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 888

    Status as of March 20, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Kaiser
    Entitled
    Consumer Protection - Used Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 889

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 438

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Burns, Anderson, Aumann, Cane, Elmore, Frank, Jennings, Nathan-Pulliam, Smigiel, Stukes, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Commercial Vehicle Warranty Enforcement - Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1084

    Status as of March 24, 2007: Bill is in the House - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Impallaria
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicle Insurers - Repair Products and Services - Rates
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 162

    Status as of March 27, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Senators Stone and Della
    Entitled
    Motor Vehicles - Certificate of Title - Rebuilt Salvage
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 640

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 342

    Sponsored By
    Senator Raskin
    Entitled
    Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers - Warranty Adjustment Programs
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters