2007 Regular Session

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 13

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 78

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Cardin
    Entitled
    Environmental Tobacco Smoke Elimination and Waiver Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 288

    Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hixson, Hubbard, Nathan-Pulliam, Ali, Anderson, Barnes, Benson, Bobo, Bronrott, Burns, Cane, Carter, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conaway, Dumais, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Goldwater, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Holmes, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, N. King, Kirk, Krysiak, Lafferty, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ramirez, Rice, Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, F. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and Walker
    Entitled
    Healthy Maryland Initiative
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 359

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 502

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frush, Ali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Bobo, Braveboy, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Carter, V. Clagett, Doory, Dumais, Elmore, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Goldwater, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kach, N. King, Krebs, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Rosenberg, Ross, Schuh, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Taylor, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 447

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 604

    Sponsored By
    St. Mary's County Delegation
    Entitled
    St. Mary's County - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 462

    Status as of February 15, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-assigned Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Nathan-Pulliam, Anderson, Benson, Burns, Cane, Carter, Conaway, Costa, Frush, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, Howard, Hubbard, Jones, Kirk, Kullen, Lee, Montgomery, Morhaim, Oaks, Proctor, Ramirez, Robinson, Ross, Stukes, Tarrant, Valderrama, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities - Grant Program and Funding
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 659

    Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Feldman, Bronrott, Cardin, Dumais, Gutierrez, Hucker, Kramer, Lawton, Lee, Manno, Mizeur, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Taylor, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Maryland Biomedical Product Development Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters and Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 754

    Status as of March 20, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hammen, Ali, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Carter, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conway, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Dumais, Elmore, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Goldwater, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, N. King, Kirk, Kramer, Krysiak, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Levi, Love, Manno, McHale, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Robinson, Rosenberg, Ross, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, F. Turner, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, Weir, Lee, Valderrama, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Children and Working Families Health Care Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 785

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 497

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Malone, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Bohanan, Boteler, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conway, Costa, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Elmore, Frank, Frush, Gilchrist, Glassman, Haddaway, Harrison, Haynes, Hecht, Heller, Hixson, Hubbard, James, Jennings, Jones, Kach, Kramer, Krebs, Krysiak, Kullen, Lawton, Love, Manno, Mathias, McConkey, Minnick, Montgomery, Morhaim, Murphy, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Ross, Rudolph, Sossi, Stull, Taylor, Vaughn, Weir, Weldon, Davis, Feldman, Jameson, and McHale
    Entitled
    Cigarette Fire Safety Performance Standard and Firefighter Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 91

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 501

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Britt, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones, Kelley, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 207

    Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Jones, Britt, Conway, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Lenett, Madaleno, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Healthy Maryland Initiative
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 361

    Status as of April 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Senators Lenett, Forehand, Britt, Colburn, Conway, Currie, Dyson, Edwards, Frosh, Haines, Hooper, Jones, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Munson, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Simonaire, Stone, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Cigarette Fire Safety Performance Standard and Firefighter Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 594

    Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Currie, Forehand, and Madaleno
    Entitled
    Maryland Biomedical Product Development Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 1017

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 218

    Sponsored By
    Senators Muse and Miller
    Entitled
    Crimes - Tobacco Paraphernalia - Distribution to Minors
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary