2007 Regular Session

Ex-Offenders

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 18

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 267

    Status as of January 31, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Stifler, Anderson, Bates, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Glassman, Kelly, Krebs, Lee, McComas, O'Donnell, Shank, Smigiel, Sossi, and Valderrama
    Entitled
    Public Safety - Offender Registry - Frequency of Photograph
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 273

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Braveboy, Ali, Anderson, Barnes, Benson, Burns, Cane, Carter, Davis, Doory, Frush, Gaines, Griffith, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kirk, Lawton, Manno, Mizeur, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ramirez, Robinson, Ross, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, Valderrama, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Voting Rights Restoration - Ex-Offenders
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 281

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 595

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hubbard and Rosenberg
    Entitled
    Mental Health - Incarcerated Individuals with Mental Illness
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 554

    Status as of March 28, 2007: Bill is in the House - Favorable with Amendments Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ross, Ali, Anderson, Braveboy, Burns, Cane, Carter, Davis, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Harrison, Haynes, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, Lawton, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ramirez, Rice, Robinson, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, F. Turner, and Walker
    Entitled
    Voter Registration Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 684

    Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McComas, Bartlett, Conaway, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Haddaway, Riley, Schuler, Shank, Smigiel, Sossi, and Stocksdale
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Registered Offenders - Substantial Change in Appearance
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 704

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Olszewski and Bromwell
    Entitled
    Registered Sex Offenders - Residence Adjacent to Locations Where Children Congregate - Prohibition in Baltimore County
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 705

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Olszewski and Bromwell
    Entitled
    Registered Sex Offenders - Residence Adjacent to Locations Where Children Congregate - Prohibition
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 938

    Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kach, Impallaria, Boteler, Costa, Elmore, J. King, Kipke, and McDonough
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Supervision, Notifications, and Penalties
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1099

    Status as of February 27, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Dumais
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Offender Registry - Minors
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 168

    Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Stone, Brochin, Colburn, Haines, Jacobs, and Mooney
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Registered Offenders - Residential Restrictions
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 337

    Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Brinkley
    Entitled
    Registered Offenders Working at Fairs and Carnivals - Prohibition
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 488

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 159

    Sponsored By
    Senators Britt, Conway, Currie, Gladden, Kelley, Pugh, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Voter Registration Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 667

    Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Referred to interim study

    Sponsored By
    Senators McFadden and Pugh
    Entitled
    Education - Personnel - Criminal Convictions
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 738

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Senators Frosh and Garagiola
    Entitled
    Criminal Procedure - Offender Registry - Minors
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 791

    Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the House - Favorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Senator Middleton
    Entitled
    Mental Health - Incarcerated Individuals with Mental Illness
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 802

    Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Senator Pugh
    Entitled
    Baltimore City - Released Inmates - Identification Card Pilot Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 847

    Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Hooper, Colburn, Gladden, Harris, Jacobs, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Driver's License Renewals - Inmates
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 1003

    Status as of March 8, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stone
    Entitled
    Criminal Law - Possession of Child Pornography - Enhanced Penalties
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings