2007 Regular Session

Homeowners Associations

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 22

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 31

    Status as of February 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Morhaim, Cardin, Costa, Kach, and Stein
    Entitled
    Community or Homeowners' Associations - Standing to Participate in Certain Proceedings
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 34

    Status as of February 5, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Morhaim, Costa, and Kach
    Entitled
    Planning and Zoning Decisions - Standing to Appeal
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 36

    Status as of April 5, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McConkey, Boteler, Lawton, Niemann, Glenn, and Shewell
    Entitled
    Home Financial Accountability Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 183

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 593

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McConkey, Beidle, Cane, and Weir
    Entitled
    Real Property - Maryland Homeowners Association Act - Enforcement Authority of Division of Consumer Protection
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 369

    Status as of April 9, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Braveboy, Griffith, Davis, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Transition of Association Control - Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 525

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McConkey, V. Clagett, Hucker, Shewell, and Weir
    Entitled
    Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Court Appointment of Receiver
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Sponsored By
    Harford County Delegation
    Entitled
    Harford County - Nuisance Abatement and Local Code Enforcement - Enforcement Authority
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 768

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates McConkey, Beidle, and Cane
    Entitled
    Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 941

    Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kach, Boteler, Bromwell, Frush, George, Hucker, Impallaria, Schuler, Shewell, Stull, and Weir
    Entitled
    Radio Communications - Regulation of Amateur Radio Equipment - Limitations
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 999

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate McConkey
    Entitled
    Real Property - Common Ownership Community Ombudsman
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1018

    Status as of March 12, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Bobo, Frush, Holmes, and Lawton
    Entitled
    Real Property - Priority of Liens - Condominium and Homeowners Associations
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1382

    Status as of March 24, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Bobo
    Entitled
    Real Property - Homeowners Associations and Condominiums - Notice Extension and Renewal of Liens
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 65

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Brochin, Della, Haines, Raskin, and Stone
    Entitled
    Community or Homeowners' Associations - Standing to Participate in Certain Proceedings
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 68

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Klausmeier and Mooney
    Entitled
    Radio Communications - Regulation of Amateur Radio Equipment - Limitations
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 159

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Brochin, Della, Klausmeier, Pugh, and Stone
    Entitled
    Planning and Zoning Decisions - Standing to Appeal
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 248

    Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Kelley, Britt, Colburn, Conway, Currie, Exum, Klausmeier, McFadden, and Miller
    Entitled
    Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Disclosures
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 285

    Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Kelley and Hooper
    Entitled
    Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 287

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 321

    Sponsored By
    Senator Kelley
    Entitled
    Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Court Appointment of Receiver
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 288

    Status as of March 19, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Kelley and Currie
    Entitled
    Real Property - Common Ownership Community Ombudsman
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 577

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 336

    Sponsored By
    Senator Jacobs
    Entitled
    Harford County - Nuisance Abatement and Local Code Enforcement - Enforcement Authority
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 605

    Status as of March 6, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Forehand
    Entitled
    Real Property - Priority of Liens - Condominium and Homeowners Associations
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 808

    Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Dyson
    Entitled
    Legal Research Committee for the Chesapeake Ranch Estates Homeowners Association
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings