2007 Regular Session

Smoking -see also- Cigarettes

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 16

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 78

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Cardin
    Entitled
    Environmental Tobacco Smoke Elimination and Waiver Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 288

    Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hixson, Hubbard, Nathan-Pulliam, Ali, Anderson, Barnes, Benson, Bobo, Bronrott, Burns, Cane, Carter, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conaway, Dumais, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Goldwater, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Holmes, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, N. King, Kirk, Krysiak, Lafferty, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ramirez, Rice, Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, F. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and Walker
    Entitled
    Healthy Maryland Initiative
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 339

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 600

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Costa, Boteler, Bromwell, Impallaria, Kach, Kaiser, J. King, Kipke, McDonough, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Weldon, Beitzel, Benson, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, Kullen, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Pendergrass, Riley, and Tarrant
    Entitled
    Health Insurance - Small Group Market - Health Benefit Plans - Rates
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 359

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 502

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Frush, Ali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Bobo, Braveboy, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Carter, V. Clagett, Doory, Dumais, Elmore, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Goldwater, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kach, N. King, Krebs, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Rosenberg, Ross, Schuh, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Taylor, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 462

    Status as of February 15, 2007: Bill is in the House - Re-assigned Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Nathan-Pulliam, Anderson, Benson, Burns, Cane, Carter, Conaway, Costa, Frush, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, Howard, Hubbard, Jones, Kirk, Kullen, Lee, Montgomery, Morhaim, Oaks, Proctor, Ramirez, Robinson, Ross, Stukes, Tarrant, Valderrama, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities - Grant Program and Funding
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
  • Sponsored By
    Delegate Dumais
    Entitled
    State Department of Education and Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Student Surveys - Workgroup
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 659

    Status as of February 14, 2007: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Feldman, Bronrott, Cardin, Dumais, Gutierrez, Hucker, Kramer, Lawton, Lee, Manno, Mizeur, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Taylor, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Maryland Biomedical Product Development Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters and Ways and Means
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 661

    Status as of March 12, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Cardin, Barnes, Boteler, Burns, Feldman, Frush, Hubbard, Kach, N. King, Kramer, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Rice, and Taylor
    Entitled
    Family Law - Foster Care - Secondhand Smoke Exposure
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 754

    Status as of March 20, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hammen, Ali, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Benson, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Bronrott, Cane, Cardin, Carter, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conway, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Dumais, Elmore, Feldman, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Goldwater, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hecht, Heller, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, N. King, Kirk, Kramer, Krysiak, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Levi, Love, Manno, McHale, McIntosh, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Robinson, Rosenberg, Ross, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Taylor, F. Turner, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, Weir, Lee, Valderrama, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Children and Working Families Health Care Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 9

    Status as of May 8, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 306

    Sponsored By
    Senator Garagiola
    Entitled
    State Department of Education and Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Student Surveys - Workgroup
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 67

    Status as of March 12, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Klausmeier
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Credit for Smoking Prohibition on the Premises of Business Establishments
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 91

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 501

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Britt, Currie, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones, Kelley, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Clean Indoor Air Act of 2007
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 207

    Status as of February 7, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Jones, Britt, Conway, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Lenett, Madaleno, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Healthy Maryland Initiative
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 594

    Status as of February 28, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Currie, Forehand, and Madaleno
    Entitled
    Maryland Biomedical Product Development Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 629

    Status as of March 21, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Lenett, Britt, Jones, Madaleno, and McFadden
    Entitled
    Health - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Minor Passenger
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 795

    Status as of February 21, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Middleton
    Entitled
    Health Care Expansion Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance