2007 Regular Session

Solar Energy

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 15

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 74

    Status as of March 27, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Krebs, Ali, Anderson, Aumann, Eckardt, Elliott, Elmore, George, Haddaway, Holmes, Kach, Kaiser, Minnick, Montgomery, Morhaim, Olszewski, Shewell, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Weldon, Bartlett, Burns, Doory, Feldman, Hecht, Impallaria, Jameson, J. King, Krysiak, Love, Manno, Mathias, McHale, Miller, Rudolph, Stifler, Taylor, Vaughn, and Walkup
    Entitled
    Solar and Geothermal Energy Grant Program - Grant Awards
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 76

    Status as of April 5, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Cardin, Barve, Bobo, Bronrott, V. Clagett, Costa, Elmore, Gilchrist, Hecht, Hixson, Ivey, Kaiser, N. King, Kipke, Krebs, Morhaim, Rice, Sophocleus, Stein, F. Turner, Bartlett, Doory, George, Howard, Jennings, Manno, McKee, Olszewski, Ross, Stukes, and Walker
    Entitled
    Solar Energy Tax Credit
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 253

    Status as of March 13, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates N. King, Ali, Bronrott, Cardin, Dumais, Feldman, Hixson, Ivey, Kramer, Krebs, Lawton, Montgomery, Murphy, Rice, and Waldstreicher
    Entitled
    Solar Energy Grant Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 328

    Status as of March 24, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Doory and Feldman
    Entitled
    Solar Energy Grant Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 451

    Status as of April 5, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Bronrott, Ali, Barkley, Bartlett, Barve, Bobo, Bromwell, V. Clagett, Donoghue, Doory, Eckardt, Elmore, Feldman, Frush, George, Goldwater, Haddaway, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, James, Jennings, N. King, Krebs, Lawton, Lee, Manno, McComas, McKee, Mizeur, Montgomery, Morhaim, Murphy, Olszewski, Pendergrass, Rice, Ross, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stein, Taylor, Waldstreicher, Cardin, Gilchrist, Ivey, Kaiser, Stukes, and Walker
    Entitled
    Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for the Purchase of Energy Efficient Products
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 590

    Status as of May 17, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 615

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Bartlett, Cardin, George, Gilchrist, Ivey, Jennings, Kaiser, N. King, McKee, Murphy, Rice, Ross, Barve, Doory, Elmore, Hixson, Howard, Krebs, Olszewski, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
    Entitled
    State Taxes - Solar Energy Grants and Devices
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 960

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Bartlett, Feldman, Haddaway, Hecht, Impallaria, Manno, Miller, Stifler, Taylor, Vaughn, and Walkup
    Entitled
    Solar and Geothermal Energy Grant Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1016

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 120

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hecht, Barkley, Barnes, Bartlett, Beidle, Bobo, Bohanan, Bronrott, Cane, G. Clagett, V. Clagett, Conaway, Conway, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Doory, Elliott, Feldman, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harrison, Heller, Hubbard, Hucker, James, Jones, Kaiser, N. King, Kirk, Kramer, Krysiak, Kullen, Lawton, Levy, Love, Malone, Manno, Mathias, McHale, McIntosh, Minnick, Mizeur, Montgomery, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rice, Riley, Robinson, Rudolph, Stull, Taylor, F. Turner, Walker, Weldon, Burns, Haddaway, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Energy
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1062

    Status as of March 23, 2007: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Stein, Mizeur, Ali, Anderson, Barve, Beidle, Bromwell, Burns, Cardin, V. Clagett, Dumais, Gutierrez, Hucker, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lawton, Mathias, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Schuler, and Tarrant
    Entitled
    Alternative Energy Acceleration Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1262

    Status as of March 22, 2007: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Haddaway, Aumann, Boteler, Cane, Eckardt, Elmore, Frank, Impallaria, Jennings, Mathias, McDonough, Shewell, Smigiel, Sossi, and Walkup
    Entitled
    Renewable Fuels - Production Credits - British Thermal Units
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 186

    Status as of January 29, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Brochin, Dyson, Forehand, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, Mooney, Munson, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Stone
    Entitled
    Solar Energy Grant Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 187

    Status as of January 29, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Garagiola, Brochin, Colburn, Dyson, Forehand, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, Mooney, Munson, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Stone
    Entitled
    Solar Energy Grant Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 293

    Status as of March 5, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Lenett, Frosh, Madaleno, Muse, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, and Zirkin
    Entitled
    Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Procurement of Renewable Energy - Solar Energy
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 595

    Status as of April 24, 2007: Became Law - Chapter 119

    Sponsored By
    Senator Garagiola
    Entitled
    Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Energy
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 829

    Status as of March 26, 2007: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Education Health and Environmental Affairs

    Sponsored By
    Senator Colburn
    Entitled
    Renewable Fuels - Production Credits - British Thermal Units
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs