2008 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1187

File Code: Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Sponsored By:
Delegates McDonough, Beitzel, Benson, Boteler, Costa, Hubbard, Kach, Kipke, Montgomery, Oaks, Riley, V. Turner, Weldon, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Donoghue, Elliott, Kullen, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, and Tarrant
Entitled:
Persons Who Operate Nursing Homes - Licensure

Synopsis:

Requiring an applicant for licensure or relicensure of a nursing home to include specified information in the application; requiring applicants to provide the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene with specified information; authorizing the Secretary to make specified approvals or denials of licensure applications after a specified review; requiring licensees to report to the Secretary changes in the financial condition of a nursing home; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occuring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/8
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/13
Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/17
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
3/31
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/20
First Reading Finance
3/25
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/31
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/1
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/22
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 686

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pat McDonough, District 7
Delegate Wendell R. Beitzel, District 1A
Delegate Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Delegate Joseph C. Boteler, III, District 8
Delegate Eric M. Bromwell, District 8
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Donald B. Elliott, District 4B
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46
Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Wade Kach, District 5B
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Richard B. Weldon, Jr., District 3B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long Term Care
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 19-1401.1 , 19-1401.2 , 19-1401.3 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 316588/01     Offered on: March 19, 2008   at: 11:05 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 837973/01     Offered on: April 3, 2008   at: 6:47 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 17, 2008: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
March 31, 2008: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 1, 2008: Third Reading Passed (43-4)