2009 Regular Session

Storage

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 12

  • Failed Legislation

    HB 83

    Status as of March 27, 2009: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Tarrant, Morhaim, Hubbard, Kullen, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Rice, V. Turner, and Weldon
    Entitled
    Health Occupations - Pharmacies - Display of SMARxT Disposal Campaign Poster
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 296

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 489

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Barnes, Bronrott, Doory, Dumais, Frick, Guzzone, Lee, Rosenberg, and Vaughn
    Entitled
    Family Law - Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 302

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 491

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Barnes, Bronrott, Doory, Dumais, Frick, Guzzone, Lee, Levi, Rosenberg, Vaughn, and Hecht
    Entitled
    Family Law - Temporary Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 828

    Status as of February 17, 2009: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Montgomery County Delegation
    Entitled
    Montgomery County - No So-Called Sexual Stimulant Pills For Kids Act MC 908-09
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 920

    Status as of March 28, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ali and Benson
    Entitled
    No So-Called Sexual Stimulant Pills for Kids Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1015

    Status as of March 24, 2009: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Jennings, Boteler, Dwyer, Ivey, Kipke, and Shank
    Entitled
    Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1263

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 713

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hucker, O'Donnell, Shewell, and Manno
    Entitled
    Mercury Switch Removal from Vehicles
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 144

    Status as of March 23, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senators Frosh, Brochin, Forehand, Muse, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Family Law - Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 267

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 488

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Forehand, Frosh, Harrington, Lenett, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Family Law - Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 268

    Status as of May 19, 2009: Became Law - Chapter 490

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Brochin, Forehand, Frosh, Harrington, Lenett, and Raskin
    Entitled
    Family Law - Temporary Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 683

    Status as of February 23, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Muse
    Entitled
    Prince George's County - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction - Tenant's Right to Reclaim Personal Property
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 812

    Status as of February 23, 2009: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Muse
    Entitled
    Landlord and Tenant - Eviction - Tenant's Right to Reclaim Personal Property
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings