2010 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 464

File Code: Taxes - Miscellaneous Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 287
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Frick, Doory, Bartlett, Beidle, Bobo, Bronrott, Cardin, Carr, Elmore, Haddaway, Hecht, Levy, Love, Manno, Mathias, Niemann, Reznik, Ross, Shewell, and Stein
Entitled:
Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2010

Synopsis:

Extending until December 31, 2015, a credit against the State income tax for electricity produced by qualified Maryland facilities from qualified energy resources; extending until December 31, 2015, the time period in which the Maryland Energy Administration may issue specified credit certificates; altering requirements for credit certificates; prohibiting the Administration from issuing initial credit certificates for less than a specified amount; providing for the refund of the credit under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Ways and Means & Economic Matters
2/12
Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/23
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order next session (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
3/24
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
4/3
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/27
First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/30
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/4
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/20
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 493

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Joseph R. Bartlett, District 4A
Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Alfred C. Carr, Jr., District 18
Delegate Ann Marie Doory, District 43
Delegate D. Page Elmore, District 38A
Delegate C. William Frick, District 16
Delegate Jeannie Haddaway, District 37B
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Murray D. Levy, District 28
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Roger P. Manno, District 19
Delegate James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38B
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Tanya T. Shewell, District 5A
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Energy Sources
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Income Tax
Power Plants
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker

Bill affects the following Statute:

Tax - General
( 10-720 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 695667/01     Offered on: March 26, 2010   at: 12:39 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 249139/01     Offered on: April 7, 2010   at: 1:10 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Budget and Taxation
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 25, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
April 3, 2010: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 4, 2010: Third Reading Passed (45-2)