2010 Regular Session

Annotated Code of Maryland

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 14

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 475

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 487

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bartlett, Bobo, Bronrott, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Eckardt, Elmore, Frush, Gaines, Haddaway, Hammen, Healey, Jones, Kullen, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Stein, Barve, Cardin, Frick, George, Gilchrist, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Murphy, Myers, Olszewski, Ross, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 613

    Status as of February 3, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ali and Morhaim
    Entitled
    Department of Health and Mental Hygiene Renaming Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 657

    Status as of March 8, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Carr and Bronrott
    Entitled
    Traffic Safety Is No Accident Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 815

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 704

    Sponsored By
    Delegates DeBoy, Jones, Barkley, Bromwell, G. Clagett, Costa, Glenn, Guzzone, Haynes, Malone, McHale, Olszewski, Schuler, and Sophocleus
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority Police Officers - Collective Bargaining
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1008

    Status as of February 18, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Davis
    Entitled
    Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Status and Renaming
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1063

    Status as of March 15, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Elliott, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elmore, Frank, George, Jenkins, Kach, Krebs, McComas, O'Donnell, Serafini, Sossi, and Stocksdale
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1324

    Status as of April 6, 2010: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Health and Government Operations

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Schuh
    Entitled
    Public General Laws - Terminology - Substitution for "Mentally Defective"
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Health and Government Operations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1533

    Status as of March 15, 2010: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    The Minority Leader
    Entitled
    Deficit Reduction Financing Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 96

    Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 37

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
    Entitled
    Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 249

    Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 52

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
    Entitled
    Public Utilities and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Cross-References
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 285

    Status as of January 27, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Della, Exum, Forehand, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, King, Klausmeier, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Stone
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 469

    Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 71

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
    Entitled
    Annual Curative Bill
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Senate Rules
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 470

    Status as of April 13, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 72

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
    Entitled
    Annual Corrective Bill
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Senate Rules
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 507

    Status as of April 9, 2010: Bill is in the House - Special Order ...

    Sponsored By
    Senator Middleton
    Entitled
    Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Status, Renaming, and Study
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Economic Matters