2010 Regular Session

Community Development

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 17

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 475

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 487

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bartlett, Bobo, Bronrott, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Eckardt, Elmore, Frush, Gaines, Haddaway, Hammen, Healey, Jones, Kullen, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Stein, Barve, Cardin, Frick, George, Gilchrist, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Murphy, Myers, Olszewski, Ross, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 888

    Status as of February 17, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Benson, Cane, Nathan-Pulliam, Ross, Stukes, and V. Turner
    Entitled
    Land Use - Community Benefit Agreements
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    HB 1097

    Status as of April 12, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hammen, Krysiak, and McHale
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Southeast Neighborhood Development Center
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1182

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 461

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ivey, Benson, Frush, McIntosh, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Ramirez, and Valderrama
    Entitled
    Business Improvement Districts
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1317

    Status as of February 24, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Economic Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Glenn, Hucker, Manno, Niemann, Schuler, Taylor, and Valderrama
    Entitled
    Public Investment Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Economic Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1377

    Status as of March 25, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Lafferty
    Entitled
    Department of Transportation - Local Development Reviews - Comments
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    HB 1495

    Status as of April 12, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Ivey, Niemann, and Ramirez
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bladensburg Market Square II
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 63

    Status as of January 13, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
    Entitled
    Transit-Oriented Development - Pledge and Use of Tax Increment Revenues - Operations and Maintenance Funding
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 285

    Status as of January 27, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Della, Exum, Forehand, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, King, Klausmeier, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Stone
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 374

    Status as of March 26, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Senator Della
    Entitled
    Baltimore City - Video Lottery Facility - Local Development Council - Membership
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 375

    Status as of March 26, 2010: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Senator Della
    Entitled
    Video Lottery Facilities - Local Impact Grants - Residential Parking Permit Costs
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Ways and Means
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 394

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 553

    Sponsored By
    Senators Exum, Conway, Currie, Harrington, Kelley, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Municipalities - Authority to Enter into Agreements with Other Municipalities
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 785

    Status as of March 8, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Peters, Lenett, Raskin, and Robey
    Entitled
    Public Investment Protection Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 813

    Status as of March 23, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Lenett and Madaleno
    Entitled
    Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 832

    Status as of March 22, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Jones
    Entitled
    Maryland Community Enhancement Transit-Oriented Development Fund
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    SB 903

    Status as of March 3, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Della
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Southeast Neighborhood Development Center
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    SB 1090

    Status as of March 5, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Harrington
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Bladensburg Market Square II
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation