2010 Regular Session

Planning, Department of

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 9

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 474

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 488

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bartlett, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Frush, Gaines, Hammen, Healey, Jones, Kullen, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, and Stein
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 475

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 487

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Bartlett, Bobo, Bronrott, Cane, Carr, V. Clagett, Davis, Donoghue, Doory, Eckardt, Elmore, Frush, Gaines, Haddaway, Hammen, Healey, Jones, Kullen, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Proctor, Ramirez, Rice, Stein, Barve, Cardin, Frick, George, Gilchrist, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Murphy, Myers, Olszewski, Ross, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means and Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 715

    Status as of April 1, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Kipke, Dwyer, George, and Schuh
    Entitled
    Department of Planning - Disposition of Real Property
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations and Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation and Education Health and Environmental Affairs
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 915

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 279

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Jones, Benson, Bohanan, Burns, Cane, Carr, Davis, Gaines, Glenn, Griffith, Harrison, Haynes, Howard, Ivey, Kirk, Levi, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Proctor, Rice, Robinson, Stukes, Taylor, F. Turner, Vallario, and Walker
    Entitled
    African American Heritage Preservation Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1377

    Status as of March 25, 2010: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Lafferty
    Entitled
    Department of Transportation - Local Development Reviews - Comments
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 278

    Status as of May 20, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 489

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Astle, Della, Exum, Forehand, Gladden, Harrington, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Miller, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Stone
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Education Health and Environmental Affairs
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 285

    Status as of January 27, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Della, Exum, Forehand, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, King, Klausmeier, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Stone
    Entitled
    Smart, Green, and Growing - The Sustainable Communities Act of 2010
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 319

    Status as of May 4, 2010: Became Law - Chapter 278

    Sponsored By
    Senators Miller, Currie, McFadden, Astle, DeGrange, Della, Dyson, Exum, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Gladden, Harrington, Jones, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lenett, Madaleno, Middleton, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Robey, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    African American Heritage Preservation Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 910

    Status as of March 3, 2010: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Lenett and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Comprehensive Energy Plan
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Education Health and Environmental Affairs