2011 Regular Session

Pedestrians

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 10

  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 263

    Status as of May 19, 2011: Became Law - Chapter 586

    Sponsored By
    Frederick County Delegation
    Entitled
    Frederick County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 832

    Status as of March 17, 2011: Bill is in the House - Withdrawn Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Montgomery County Delegation
    Entitled
    Montgomery County - Solicitation of Money or Donations from Occupants of Vehicles - Adoption of a Permit Program MC 20-11
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 839

    Status as of March 24, 2011: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Judiciary

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Sophocleus, Clippinger, Anderson, Barkley, Burns, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Frank, Frush, George, Haynes, Kipke, Love, McConkey, B. Robinson, Simmons, Wilson, and Wood
    Entitled
    Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Use of a Motor Vehicle
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Judiciary
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 948

    Status as of March 14, 2011: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Holmes
    Entitled
    Land Use - State Rail Station Overlay Districts
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    HB 1104

    Status as of May 10, 2011: Became Law - Chapter 376

    Sponsored By
    Prince George's County Delegation
    Entitled
    Prince George's County - Permit Program for Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Sunset Extension PG 402-11
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1223

    Status as of April 5, 2011: Bill is in the House - House Conference Committee Appointed

    Sponsored By
    Delegate Malone
    Entitled
    Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Task Force - Reconstitution
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 12

    Status as of March 31, 2011: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stone
    Entitled
    Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Advisory Committee
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 226

    Status as of April 12, 2011: Became Law - Chapter 40

    Sponsored By
    Senator Dyson
    Entitled
    Bicycle and Pedestrian Advisory Committee - Meetings
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Sponsored By
    Senators Brinkley and Young
    Entitled
    Frederick County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Program
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 337

    Status as of February 2, 2011: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings

    Sponsored By
    Senator Stone
    Entitled
    Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Use of a Motor Vehicle
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Judicial Proceedings