2012 Regular Session

Bridges and Tunnels

Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 20

  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 40

    Status as of February 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Smigiel, Cluster, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, Kach, McComas, McDermott, Schulz, and Vitale
    Entitled
    Transportation - Toll, Fee, or Other Charge Increases - Notice and Public Comment
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 275

    Status as of February 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Weir, Aumann, Boteler, Cluster, Jacobs, Minnick, and Olszewski
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 576

    Status as of March 29, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Arora, Bohanan, Clagett, Gaines, Griffith, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, James, Jones, Lafferty, Lee, Love, A. Miller, Niemann, Proctor, Ross, Rudolph, Summers, Washington, Beidle, Glenn, Guzzone, Tarrant, Walker, B. Robinson, Mizeur, and Zucker
    Entitled
    Public-Private Partnerships
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters and Appropriations
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 685

    Status as of February 8, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegate McDonough
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Legislative Approval Required
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1157

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hershey, Afzali, Bates, Boteler, Cluster, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Jacobs, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Norman, O'Donnell, Ready, Schulz, Serafini, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Fixing or Revising Tolls - Legislative Approval Required
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1251

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hershey, Boteler, Cluster, Haddaway-Riccio, McComas, McDermott, Afzali, Aumann, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, Jacobs, Kipke, W. Miller, Otto, Ready, Schulz, and Stocksdale
    Entitled
    Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Authority
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed Legislation

    HB 1259

    Status as of March 26, 2012: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Appropriations

    Sponsored By
    Delegates Hershey, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Cluster, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, McDermott, W. Miller, O'Donnell, Otto, Ready, Schulz, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Audit Statements Available Online
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    HB 1375

    Status as of March 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Environmental Matters

    Sponsored By
    Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
    Entitled
    Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
    Committee
    Assignments
    House: Environmental Matters
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 3

    Status as of February 8, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senator Simonaire
    Entitled
    Maryland Toll Accountability Act
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 62

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Stone, Brochin, McFadden, Reilly, and Simonaire
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Fixing or Revising Tolls - Legislative Approval Required
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 210

    Status as of February 20, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Stone, Colburn, Dyson, Gladden, Klausmeier, and Pipkin
    Entitled
    Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 260

    Status as of February 27, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, and Pipkin
    Entitled
    Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation and Finance
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 358

    Status as of April 6, 2012: Bill is in the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments

    Sponsored By
    The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Colburn, Currie, DeGrange, Garagiola, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, Pugh, and Rosapepe
    Entitled
    Public-Private Partnerships
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
    House: Environmental Matters and Appropriations
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 693

    Status as of April 1, 2012: Bill is in the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Kittleman, Middleton, Pugh, Simonaire, and Stone
    Entitled
    Task Force to Study Toll Rates and the Funding of Transportation Facilities Projects
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
    House: House Rules and Executive Nominations
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 818

    Status as of March 23, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Third Reading Failed

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, and Getty
    Entitled
    Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
  • Became Law - Governor Signed

    SB 820

    Status as of May 22, 2012: Became Law - Chapter 592

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Glassman, Klausmeier, Shank, and Stone
    Entitled
    Transportation - Toll, Fee, or Other Charge Increases - Required Procedures
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance
    House: Ways and Means
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 824

    Status as of February 9, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Colburn, and Getty
    Entitled
    Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Authority
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation and Finance
  • Failed Legislation

    SB 825

    Status as of March 23, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Glassman, Klausmeier, and Stone
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Audits - Statements Available Online
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation
  • Failed - Dead Legislation

    SB 828

    Status as of February 15, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Finance

    Sponsored By
    Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Reilly, Shank, and Stone
    Entitled
    Maryland Transportation Authority - Fixing or Revising Tolls - Legislative Approval Required
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Finance and Budget and Taxation
  • Became Law - Bond Bill rolled into Capital Budget

    SB 1070

    Status as of March 6, 2012: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Budget and Taxation

    Sponsored By
    Senator Edwards
    Entitled
    Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western Maryland Railroad Lift Bridge
    Committee
    Assignments
    Senate: Budget and Taxation