Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 51
Status as of February 24, 1997: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 6, 1997: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 6, 1997: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 6, 1997: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 3, 1997: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 10, 1997: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 20, 1997: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters
Status as of March 6, 1997: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 18, 1997: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters