Status of Legislation
Total number of Bills: 31
Status as of March 8, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of February 18, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Status as of May 26, 2004: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill was signed
Status as of March 1, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 4, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Status as of May 26, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 515
Status as of April 5, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of April 27, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 198
Status as of March 8, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of May 25, 2004: Vetoed by the Governor - Policy
Status as of April 5, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Finance
Status as of March 27, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 10, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of March 29, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 27, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of March 8, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Economic Matters
Status as of May 26, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 532
Status as of May 11, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 402
Status as of March 27, 2004: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Ways and Means
Status as of February 25, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Judiciary
Status as of March 3, 2004: Bill is in the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Status as of March 3, 2004: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Ways and Means
Status as of March 3, 2004: Bill is in the House - Re-referred Ways and Means
Status as of January 16, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 11, 2004: Became Law - Chapter 251
Status as of February 18, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 5, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Judicial Proceedings
Status as of March 19, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 11, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Status as of May 26, 2004: Vetoed by the Governor - Cross-filed bill was signed
Status as of March 1, 2004: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs