Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rules Committee

Chair
Senator Katherine Klausmeier
Vice Chair
Senator James E. DeGrange, Sr.
Address
Senate Meeting Room H-124
State House
Annapolis, Maryland 21401
Phone
410-841-3700
301-858-3700
Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3700
Staff
Office of the Senate President: Victoria L. Gruber
Issue Areas
Considers proposals concerning the rules, organization, and procedures of the Senate or the legislature
Reviews legislation introduced after the bill introduction deadline and decides whether to re-refer those bills to the appropriate principal standing committees
Further Information
Witness Guidelines and Committee FAQs
Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 /CH0061
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 /CH0062
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 (HB1536)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB1614)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1133 (HB0532)
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1136 (HB1179)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1139 (HB1624)
Title
University of Maryland Eastern Shore - State Matching Funds for Land-Grant Institutions
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1145 (HB1615)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1163 (HB0244)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1180
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 1
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0210/CH0467)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0200/CH0743)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0493 /CH0061 Annual Curative Bill President 6 1 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0494 /CH0062 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 1 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1079 (HB1536) State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice Senator Bates 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1116 (HB1614) Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act Senator Benson 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1133 (HB0532) Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Senator Oaks 2 1 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1136 (HB1179) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Senator Oaks 2 1 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1139 (HB1624) University of Maryland Eastern Shore - State Matching Funds for Land-Grant Institutions Senator McFadden 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1145 (HB1615) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1163 (HB0244) Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery Senator Peters 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1180 Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 1 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
HB0071 (SB0210/CH0467) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food Service Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0240 (SB0200/CH0743) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts Delegate Walker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
As of:
Loading...
Analyses/Regulation
COMAR Title/Subtitle DLS Control No. Reg Type Agency Analysis Reg
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM