HB0295 (CH0262)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/20/20141/20/2014First Reading Economic Matters
1/28/20141/28/2014Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Favorable with Amendments {463091/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/5 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 40
3/5/20143/5/2014Floor Committee Amendment {123291/1 Adopted41
Floor Committee Amendment {703028/1 Adopted41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {403525/1 Adopted41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {583927/1 Rejected (45-87)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {223625/1 Rejected (43-91)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {423829/4 Rejected (47-89)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {763626/1 Rejected (45-88)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {603523/1 Rejected (46-88)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {343720/1 Rejected (47-83)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {583621/1 Rejected (42-90)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {183927/1 Rejected (45-83)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {363222/1 Rejected (46-89)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {703723/1 Rejected (43-87)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hogan) {773521/1 Rejected (44-84)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {343920/1 Rejected (8-124)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {433426/1 Rejected (43-89)41
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {463721/1 Rejected41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/7/20143/7/2014Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted43
Third Reading Passed (89-46)43
Senate3/10/20143/7/2014First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation41A
3/17/20143/17/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20144/4/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/4/20143/26/2014Favorable with Amendments {717170/1 Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {223725/1 Rejected (13-34)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {103921/1 Rejected (17-29)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {303024/1 Rejected (13-33)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {313822/1 Rejected (16-30)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {383825/1 Rejected (18-29)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {883824/1 Rejected (13-34)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {893022/1 Rejected (19-27)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {553725/1 Rejected (12-34)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {383524/1 Rejected (13-32)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {513622/1 Rejected (10-36)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {573828/1 Withdrawn60
Floor Amendment (Senators Edwards and Shank) {763921/2 Rejected (16-30)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {783329/1 Rejected (13-34)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {473626/1 Rejected (13-33)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {973821/1 Rejected (13-34)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {523521/1 Rejected (13-32)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {653829/1 Rejected (15-31)60
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {983029/1 Rejected (13-34)60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20143/27/2014Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {903229/1 Rejected (17-29)61
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {573828/2 Adopted (44-3)61
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {703521/1 Rejected (23-24)61
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {653225/2 Withdrawn61
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {653225/4 Rejected61
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {563223/2 Rejected (13-33)61
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {563223/3 Rejected (13-32)61
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {963521/1 Rejected (11-34)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)61
House4/5/20143/30/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 66
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed (87-47)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.