Rules

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0506 / CH0008Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0507 / CH0009Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0576
    (HB0168)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0977
    (HB0004)
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0990
    (HB0289)
Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - ProhibitedSenator CurrieIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1093Public Health - Construction of Laws Governing Medical Cannabis - Liability for Costs Resulting From UseSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1101Jurors - Qualification - Prior ConvictionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1132Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and FeeSenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0028Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0468
    (SB0097 / CH0348)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0595
    (SB0497)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActDelegate HayesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0699
    (SB0700)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0708
    (SB0781 / CH0232)
Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - EstablishmentDelegate GutierrezIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB0778Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0908Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0976CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartyDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesFamily Law (D4)
HB1319
    (SB0620 / CH0415)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1369Harford County Student Loan Refinancing AuthorityDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1410
    (SB0493 / CH0740)
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1504Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and EnforcementDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB1506Natural Resources - Wildlife and HuntingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1556
    (SB1128 / CH0712)
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective BargainingDelegate FoldenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
RulesCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1603
    (SB0937 / CH0703)
Sustainable Oyster Population and Fishery Act of 2016Delegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1615
    (SB1126 / CH0470)
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High SchoolDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1640
    (SB1167)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActCarroll County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1642
    (SB1158 / CH0713)
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology TransferDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHigher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 28, 2016 6:58 A.M.