Status of Legislation
Total Number of Bills: 33
Status as of March 5, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 4, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Withdrawn Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of February 14, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of March 15, 1996: Bill is in the Senate - Unfavorable Economic and Environmental Affairs
Status as of April 4, 1996: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Commerce and Government Matters