Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission – Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Long, Davis, Harris, T. Morgan, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $900,000 to $1,000,000 the amount of an appropriation that the Governor is required to include in the annual budget bill each year for the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland from the Cigarette Restitution Fund; repealing the termination of certain provisions of law that require the Governor to include the appropriation in the annual budget bill each year and the Council to use the appropriation to fund the activities of the Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0589
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission – Funding
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {633723/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission – Funding
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Referred Rules 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 10:52 PM
Click to return on the top page