Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

House Index

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number
January 12, 2022 January 12, 2022 1 (Journalized)
January 13, 2022 January 13, 2022 2
January 17, 2022 January 17, 2022 3
January 19, 2022 January 19, 2022 4
January 24, 2022 January 19, 2022 4-A
January 26, 2022 January 20, 2022 5
January 27, 2022 January 21, 2022 6
January 27, 2022 January 22, 2022 7
January 27, 2022 January 22, 2022 7-A
Proceedings
Calendar Date
January 12, 2022
Legislative Date
January 12, 2022
Proceedings Number
1 (Journalized)
Calendar Date
January 13, 2022
Legislative Date
January 13, 2022
Proceedings Number
2
Calendar Date
January 17, 2022
Legislative Date
January 17, 2022
Proceedings Number
3
Calendar Date
January 19, 2022
Legislative Date
January 19, 2022
Proceedings Number
4
Calendar Date
January 24, 2022
Legislative Date
January 19, 2022
Proceedings Number
4-A
Calendar Date
January 26, 2022
Legislative Date
January 20, 2022
Proceedings Number
5
Calendar Date
January 27, 2022
Legislative Date
January 21, 2022
Proceedings Number
6
Calendar Date
January 27, 2022
Legislative Date
January 22, 2022
Proceedings Number
7
Calendar Date
January 27, 2022
Legislative Date
January 22, 2022
Proceedings Number
7-A
Last Updated: 1/27/2022 3:54 PM
Click to return on the top page