Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Ferguson, and Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Maryland Trauma Physician Services Fund to include subsidizing the documented costs incurred by the State primary adult resource center to maintain certain on-call and standby health care providers; and requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to develop certain guidelines for the reimbursement of certain costs.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0607
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text - Chapter - Maryland Trauma Fund - State Primary Adult Resource Center - Reimbursement of On-Call and Standby Costs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page