Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Sponsored by
Delegate Folden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding State residency to the eligibility requirements for dedicating a bridge or another appropriate structure to a deceased member of the armed forces.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/07/2017
Legislative Date
11/07/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {260516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/07/2017 11/07/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {260516/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page