Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barve, Hill, Ebersole, Lafferty, Pendergrass, Fraser-Hidalgo, Tarlau, Robinson, and Ciliberti
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a diesel-powered motor vehicle to emit clearly visible smoke, soot, or other exhaust emissions onto another person or motor vehicle; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0848 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/23/2016
Legislative Date
8/23/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-30)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/23/2016 8/23/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-30) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
(   21-1130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page