Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Fiscal Impact Statements for Proposed Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Smigiel, Haddaway-Riccio, and Otto
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to clarify that a promulgating unit is required to submit a specified fiscal impact statement with a proposed regulation to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review and the Department of Legislative Services; and altering a specified provision of law to prohibit a unit from adopting a proposed regulation until after a specified fiscal impact statement is submitted with the proposed regulation to the Committee for preliminary review.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0151
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/05/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/05/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
(   10-110, 10-111, 10-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page