Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Afzali, Arentz, Carozza, Grammer, S. Howard, Impallaria, Krebs, Long, McKay, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Wivell, Fisher, Szeliga, Kipke, Folden, Vogt, Ciliberti, and Hornberger
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets certain requirements except the required certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a certain firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0027
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1036 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/30/2017
Legislative Date
8/30/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/30/2017 8/30/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Hettleman) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page