Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "electric personal assistive mobility device" to require that the device have one vertical or center control bar or mechanism that responds to pressure from the hands or legs of the rider to steer the device and have a nonarticulating platform on which the rider stands.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0051 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/14/2017
Legislative Date
11/14/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/14/2017 11/14/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
(   21-101, 21-1201, 21-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page