Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for specified vehicles a registration plate honoring the armed forces of the United States; requiring that fees charged for the plates be used only for specified purposes; requiring a registration plate issued under the Act to contain a specified graphic design and specified words; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations to carry out the provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0051 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/17/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/17/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
(   13-619.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page