Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a definition to make specified provisions of law requiring State's Attorney review of an application for a statement of charges against a law enforcement officer applicable to an application for a statement of charges against specified other law enforcement officers.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0207
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0359 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {538779/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page