Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility criteria for membership on the State Board of Architects and the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors; requiring at least three members of the State Board of Architects to hold a professional degree from an architecture program accredited by the National Architectural Accrediting Board; requiring one member of the State Board for Professional Land Surveyors to be either a licensed property line surveyor or a professional land surveyor; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0077
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter -
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text - Chapter -
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page