Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Jameson, West, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering an exception to the requirement that an individual be admitted to the Maryland Bar before the individual may practice law in the State by authorizing an individual who is admitted to the bar of any other state to provide legal advice to the individual's employer or the employer's organizational affiliates.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0794
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {702515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {702515/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text - Chapter - Legal Advice to Corporations - Clarification
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page