Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Physicians - Payments for Office Visits
Sponsored by
Delegate Costa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a licensed physician from presenting or causing to be presented a claim, bill, or demand for payment for an office visit if the physician did not commence treatment within a specified amount of time; establishing an exception; authorizing a licensed physician to present or cause to be presented a specified claim for payment for a procedure performed during a specified office visit; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/18/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page