Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, and Ghrist
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property in Kent County on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0628
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-5)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (128-5) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page