Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Flat Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates Serafini and F. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax rate to 3.5% for individuals with Maryland taxable income in excess of $30,000; altering the county income tax rate to 2.3% on all Maryland taxable income of individuals; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Date Posted Document Name
1/22/2014 Text - First - Income Tax - Flat Tax
(   10-105, 10-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page