Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Public Art - Report on Identification, Protection, and Maintenance
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the City of Baltimore and the Baltimore City Public School System to report to the Baltimore City delegation to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017, on the status of the implementation of specified recommendations concerning the identification, protection, and maintenance of public art located on specified campuses and within specified buildings.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984963/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Public Art - Verification of Location by Legislative Auditor
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {984963/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Public Art - Report on Identification, Protection, and Maintenance
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page