Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the authority of a county or local government to employ only plumbing inspectors who hold a master plumbing license issued by specified entities; authorizing a county or local government to hire plumbing inspectors who obtain certification by the International Code Council as a mechanical inspector within 6 months of being hired; providing that plumbing and HVAC inspectors must have at least 5 years of experience before being appointed or employed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page