Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing funds in the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for the costs associated with the purchase of specified nutrient load reductions, not to exceed a specified amount per year in specified years; requiring the load reductions purchased under the Act to be consistent with specified accounting procedures; requiring the Department of the Environment on or before October 1, 2020, to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0314
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460017/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {460017/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {624630/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text - Chapter - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page