Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner and Hill
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Racing Commission to employ an equine medical director; and requiring the Commission to direct that thoroughbred and standardbred track licensees, thoroughbred and standardbred owners and trainers, and thoroughbred and standardbred breeders pay the cost of employing the equine medical director based on a certain percentage.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0463
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0481 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page