Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Convictions - Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson and J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Correcting incorrect references relating to expungement; repealing incorrect references relating to expungement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Convictions - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {472114/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Convictions - Clarification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Convictions - Clarification
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {472114/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Convictions - Clarification
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page