Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing in Harford County a provision of law stating that a condition of a common direct or indirect sharing between specified persons of profit from the sale of alcoholic beverages gives rise to a presumption of indirect ownership interest in an alcoholic beverages license.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1177
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433092/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in More Than One License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {433092/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
(   22-102, 22-1501, 22-1503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page