Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that the requirements for party affiliation for a candidate for office do not apply to a candidate for judge of the orphans' court, except in Anne Arundel County; requiring that, except in Anne Arundel County, a certificate of candidacy for judge of the orphans' court be filed with the State Board of Elections; altering the order in which offices to be voted on appear on a ballot; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0327
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {115265/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {903520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {745769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-19)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {115265/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 45
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {903520/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {745769/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (118-19) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-302, 5-706, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page