Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing, in Montgomery County, an individual who is at least 55 years of age to conduct a bingo game involving cash prizes if the game is conducted at a certain residential property that is restricted to residents who are at least 55 years of age and is conducted in a certain manner.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0143 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {579234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {579234/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 1-19
(   13-1803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page