Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that a Class BC beer, wine, and liquor license holder provide food for consumption at certain catered events in Carroll County so that either the license holder or the event sponsor shall provide food for the catered event.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0297
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443797/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {443797/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
(   16-102, 16-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page