Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Afzali, Corderman, Dumais, McComas, Proctor, Reilly, and Rose
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain law enforcement unit to provide a copy of a certain domestic violence incident report on request to the victim without charge and within 48 hours after the request.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-502, 4-503.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page