Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly and Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to use the most recent treatment criteria developed by the American Society of Addiction Medicine for addictive, substance-related, and co-occurring conditions for all medical necessity and utilization management determinations for substance use disorder benefits; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0631
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576284/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits - Requirements and Reports
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {576284/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Coverage for Mental Health Benefits and Substance Use Disorder Benefits – Treatment Criteria
(   15-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page